WHADDON WAY CHURCH (ANGLICAN/BAPTIST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP, JUNIOR CHURCH ACTIVITIES AND CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE. DROP-IN AND LUNCH CLUB FOR MAINLY OLDER ADULTS. CLASSES FOR ADULTS AND CHILDREN TO IMPROVE NUMERACY & LITERACY SKILLS.TODDLER GROUP. SUPPORT FOR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING IN LOCAL COMMUNITY, INTERNATIONAL AID, DEVELOPMENT AND ENVIRONMENTAL PROJECTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 02 November 2011: Standard registration
- WHADDON WAY CHURCH (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Holden | Chair | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ormrod | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adeyinka Daniel-Ogunaike | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan North | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheraya Fourie | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rita James | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.59k | £191.30k | £78.01k | £80.48k | £90.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.77k | £90.87k | £79.73k | £58.33k | £77.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/10/2011 AS AMENDED ON 14/04/2015
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whaddon Way Church
Beaverbrook Court
Bletchley
MILTON KEYNES
MK3 7JS
- Phone:
- 01908372072
- Email:
- trustees@whaddonway.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window