SHACKS BARN & BUCKINGHAM RDA GROUP

Charity number: 1145480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a member group of The Riding for the Disabled Association which co-ordinates all groups ensuring standards of safety & teaching & providing information & training opportunities. Riding sessions are taken by a trained instructor and each rider has up to three helpers according to their level of competence.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £13,174
Total expenditure: £23,370

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Animals
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 January 2012: Standard registration
  • 31 October 2020: Funds received from 1074105 SILVERSTONE GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIAT...
  • 16 August 2021: Funds received from 1073559 BUCKINGHAM AND GREENACRES RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SHACKS BARN & BUCKINGHAM RDA (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jean Kenealy Trustee 08 November 2023
None on record
Deborah Ann Saunders Trustee 08 November 2023
None on record
Alison Louise Pocock Trustee 08 November 2023
None on record
Sonia Anne Dunn Trustee 08 November 2023
None on record
Zoe Jones Trustee 31 March 2017
NORTH BUCKINGHAM PARISH PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL
Received: On time
THE MAJOR CHARLES HALL MEMORIAL CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days
FIONA SUTHERS Trustee 11 June 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.73k £13.08k £31.03k £11.56k £13.17k
Total expenditure £19.80k £11.03k £13.07k £15.94k £23.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 March 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Rosemount
Wicken Road
Leckhampstead
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 5NZ
Phone:
01280860288