ROBERT CLACK DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This fund is to be used for a variety of purposes such as achievement awards, educational trips and helping further education for disadvantaged students
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Barking And Dagenham
Governance
- 08 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN PITTAWAY | Trustee | 08 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
SIR PAUL GRANT | Trustee | 22 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £14.44k | £3.76k | £2.60k | £2.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.78k | £1.57k | £10.53k | £8.83k | £4.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 NOV 2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE ROBERT CLACK SCHOOL IN DAGENHAM, ESSEX (THE SCHOOL), IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY FINANCIALLY SUPPORTING PUPILS WISHING TO STUDY AT THE SCHOOL OR IN SUBSEQUENT FURTHER EDUCATION AND BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Battlefield Road
St. Albans
AL1 4DA
- Phone:
- 01727861096
- Email:
- gary.white@aspen-waite.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window