Financial history TORAS CHAIM

Charity number: 1147957
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.66k £21.49k £22.41k £21.29k £24.22k
Total expenditure £15.82k £18.41k £18.91k £21.57k £28.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A