CAMBRIDGE WOODWIND MAKERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserve the art of woodwind instrument making and repair.The charity provides workshops and courses to teach the theory and skills of instrument making and repair with a particular emphasis on schools. We also provide day courses in the applied arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL HUGH BANGHAM | Chair | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Colin Hamilton | Trustee | 08 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHYLLIS LAURA CHAMPION | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.97k | £69.83k | £84.57k | £65.70k | £189.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.68k | £73.16k | £77.43k | £51.47k | £102.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.58k | £18.87k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 14 September 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 14 September 2022 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/10/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE RESTRICTED TO: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS BY THE PROMOTION OF THE CRAFT OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENT MAKING AND REPAIR; 2. THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CRAFT OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENT MAKING AND REPAIR: AND 3. RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cambridge Makers
Unit 6
Lintech Court
The Grip
Linton
CAMBRIDG
- Phone:
- 01223890308
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window