STREET CHILD UNITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a global movement for street children to receive the protection & opportunities that all children are entitled to. Ahead of the FIFA and ICC World Cups, we unite street children from around the world through football, cricket, art & campaigning. Our aim is to challenge the negative perceptions & treatment of street children globally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£889,485
Donations and legacies | £889.49k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£704,136
Raising funds | £11.01k | |
Charitable activities | £693.13k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £11.01k | |
Charitable expenditure | £693.13k | |
Retained for future use | £185.35k |
People

6 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Canada
- United States
Governance
- 07 December 2011: Standard registration
- 22 June 2016: Funds received from 1048316 MOMENTUM ARTS
- STREET CHILD WORLD CUP, STREET CHILD WORLD CHAMPIONSHIP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEXANDER JAMES WHITE | Chair | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jitesh Patel | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Walter Kent Christian | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Fluskey | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Niul Hatcher | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Greg Clements | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malini Skandachanmugarasan | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Arun Midha | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Archana Devi Glendening | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Preeti Shetty | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Cullen | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £499.68k | £423.71k | £339.49k | £829.84k | £889.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £512.11k | £288.51k | £384.97k | £631.01k | £704.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £829.84k | £889.49k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £620.45k | £693.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.56k | £11.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.78k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £299.53k | £498.03k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.20k | £25.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/01/2012
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; (B) RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (C) RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (D) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (E) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; (F) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; (G) INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; AND (H) ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. (2) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ARTICLE 3(2), "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. (3) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE STREET CHILDREN BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; AND (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 ABBEY ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB5 8HQ
- Phone:
- 02076147696
- Email:
- info@streetchildunited.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window