CENTRO CRISTIANO MONTE DE SION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities for the church are as follows: 1) Various home group meetings during mid week 2) Weekly prayer meetings 3) Various Bible study courses for Church members and new Christians. 4) Weekly evangelistic events in the local community 5) Monthly youth meetings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 15 November 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAURICIO ARBOLEDA | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
NORBERTO RUIZ | Trustee | 15 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
LOURDES GUADALUPE NAPA PAZMINO AAT | Trustee | 15 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JULIETA RUIZ | Trustee | 15 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.40k | £24.53k | £23.73k | £18.53k | £9.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.25k | £23.15k | £21.38k | £17.69k | £16.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £24.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 911 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 911 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 December 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 SEP 2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 ST. JOSEPHS FLATS
DRUMMOND CRESCENT
LONDON
NW1 1LE
- Phone:
- 07886016931
- Email:
- MONTEDESION@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window