AGE UK FOLKESTONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting and assisting in the provision of care and support services to older people in Folkestone and the surrounding districts. A Centre provides social & educational activities, transport to and from the centre for clients, lunch, meals at home, refreshments and social opportunities. We provide an information and advice service including assistance with maximising income etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- AGE CONCERN FOLKESTONE (FOLKESTONE OLD PEOPLES WELFARE COMMITTEE) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM FLAVELL | Chair | 28 April 2017 |
|
|||||
TIMOTHY SCOTT | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
HUGH BARKER | Trustee | 09 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANET ANDREWS | Trustee | 14 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £436.51k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £371.77k | £514.18k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £202.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 AUG 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) IS ESTABLISHED AND TO WHICH IT IS SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED ARE TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR OLDER PEOPLE IN AND AROUND FOLKSTONE AND DISTRICT(THE AREA OF BENEFIT): PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF OLDER PEOPLE; ADVANCING EDUCATION; PREVENTING OR RELIEVING SICKNESS, DISEASE OR SUFFERING IN OLDER PEOPLE (WHETHER EMOTIONAL, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL); PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL EXCLUSION OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; THE OUTCOME OF THIS BEING THE PROMOTION OF THE WELL-BEING OF OLDER PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Centre for the Retired
3 Park Street
DEAL
CT14 6AG
- Phone:
- 07833473903
- Email:
- admin@ageukfolkestone.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window