JUBILEE SOCIETY OF MONGOLIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prevention or relief of poverty in Mongolia: Providing food, fuel, education and training in healthcare projects and occasional grants. Providing employment for Mongolian workers within the poor districts surrounding Ulaanbaatar. The work is primarily but not exclusively among children. Most of the work is carried out through a Mongolian NGO where the workers are known and visited by the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Mongolia
Governance
- 06 December 2011: Standard registration
- JSM (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEELY ALEXIS HAMMOND | Chair | 06 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Rev James Richard Dwyer | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEORGE DEEGAN | Trustee | 18 January 2012 |
|
|||||
MRS JUDY DEEGAN | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE COOLEY | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
JAMES BRENDAN BUCKLEY BSC ACMA | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elisabeth Simpson | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|||||
PHILIP TYNDALE SIMPSON | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
LYNETTE ELIZABETH RIMMER | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/06/2020 | 13/06/2021 | 13/06/2022 | 13/06/2023 | 13/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.80k | £40.46k | £30.95k | £22.49k | £22.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.14k | £41.47k | £40.10k | £30.13k | £38.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 June 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 June 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 June 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 June 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 June 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 June 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 June 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 June 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 JUN 2011
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY IN MONGOLIA BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING IN MONGOLIA TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN MONGOLIA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE EDUCATION,TRAINING,HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 CHAPEL ROAD
FLACKWELL HEATH
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP10 9AA
- Phone:
- 01628533004
- Email:
- jubilee@ccfh.org.uk
- Website:
-
jubileesocietyofmongolia.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window