Financial history BARMBY MOOR PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 502344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.42k £18.70k £10.84k £22.60k £17.07k
Total expenditure £9.50k £5.14k £8.84k £15.27k £15.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A