CHOSEN WOMEN OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting and impacting the lives of elderly, women in need (sick, poor, elderly, widows), children and young people primarily through cash, gift donations, events, seminars, mentoring and training. Our activities include health and well being support, welfare support for elderly & widows (poverty eradication), enterprise and business support, education & training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Nigeria
- South Africa
Governance
- 17 April 2012: Standard registration
- CWO (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH FALADE | Chair | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNE OLASOJI | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOY EDOZIE | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
FOLA EGBOH | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER GODWINS | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
TOYIN ODUNWO | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA OLANIYI | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/08/2018 | 28/08/2019 | 28/08/2020 | 28/08/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.27k | £4.84k | £6.02k | £12.71k | £1.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.03k | £5.71k | £3.97k | £7.51k | £4.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 August 2021 | 27 October 2022 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 August 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 JAN 2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF CHOSEN WOMEN OUTREACH ARE: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO WOMEN AND CHILDREN IN NEED AND ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE WOMEN AND CHILDREN TO GENERATE SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF SUFFICIENT. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO WOMEN AND CHILDREN WHO THROUGH LACK OF MEANS WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE. TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF WOMEN ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD SUFFERING BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH WOMEN TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 Canonsleigh Road
DAGENHAM
RM9 4DJ
- Phone:
- 07931607600
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window