MULAN FOUNDATION NETWORK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To empower Chinese as leaders in their community and celebrate the economic and social contribution of Chinese in the UK, supporting disadvantage Chinese by providing training and education in welfare, health and housing. Recognising and honouring the achievements of Chinese Women through awards and in the process build up a network of top and successful Chinese women and younger Chinese Women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wan Chun Yip | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Mei See Tang nee Hon | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Swee Ooi | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Yee-Mei Lai | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
LUISE INGRID SCHAFER OBE | Trustee | 14 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
LADY KATY BLAIR MBE MBE | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.50k | £1.65k | £3.70k | £1.10k | £21.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.82k | £655 | £3.38k | £616 | £17.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 May 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 May 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/05/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/05/2012
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE CHINESE AND EAST ASIAN COMMUNITY WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN BY PREVENTING THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THEIR NEEDS AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. 2. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 10
Harvil Court
1 Mornington Close
LONDON
NW9 5HH
- Phone:
- 0207 549 7890
- Email:
- info@mulanfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window