THE SAGA CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
'The umbrella for all of Saga's charitable activities. The Foundation can raise funds for the Saga Charitable Trust, which helps underprivileged communities in developing countries, and the Respite for Carers Charitable Trust providing breaks for unpaid carers aged over 50 living in the UK. In addition it can commission research into lives of the over 50s'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 May 2012: Standard registration
- 27 February 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2013 | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | 23 January 2017 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2015 | 28 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2014 | 10 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27/04/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ISSUES RELATING TO PEOPLE OVER 50 AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS. 2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window