THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE COUNTY HOSPITAL, HEREFORD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 24 April 1973: Standard registration
- 25 February 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF COUNTY AND GENERAL HOSPITALS, HEREFORD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.51k | £376 | £17.83k | £30 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.45k | £5.69k | £7.71k | £10.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 29 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 29 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 15 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 25 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 06 April 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 07 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES DATED 21 FEBRUARY 1973, AMENDED 11 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE COUNTY HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM, OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window