PURLEY ISLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to advance the religion of Islam in accordance with the tenants and doctrines of the Sunni and Hanafi School of thought. To relieve financial Hardship. Promotion of racial harmony. To advance education in Islam. To secure premises for the benefit of the community and the furtherance of the Objectives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
Governance
- 29 March 2012: Standard registration
- PICC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Waqar Ahmad | Chair | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Khaja Yunus Sharif | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hafeez Bux Daud Khan | Trustee | 06 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hassan Akhtar | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £316.65k | £574.60k | £370.97k | £558.79k | £433.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.55k | £77.32k | £96.37k | £157.89k | £176.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £574.57k | N/A | £498.24k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £38.41k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £30 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £22.14k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £77.32k | N/A | £147.99k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | £9.90k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/03/2012
Charitable objects
3. THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 3.1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF THE SUNNI AND HANAFI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT. 3.2) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 3.3) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:(A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN THE MUSLIM AND OTHER COMMUNITIES;(B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; AND (C) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE. 3.4) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR ADULTS AND CHILDREN. 3.5) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
130 Brighton Road
PURLEY
Surrey
CR8 4EX
- Phone:
- 0 7982 446062
- Email:
- management@purleymasjid.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window