ABERCROMBIE & KENT PHILANTHROPY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Abercrombie & Kent Philanthropy is deeply committed to worldwide conservation and working together with regional non-governmental organisations and local people to inspire and develop sound community conservation and health practices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Antarctica
- Australia
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Cambodia
- Canada
- Colombia
- Egypt
- Iceland
- India
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Laos
- Morocco
- New Zealand
- Peru
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Uganda
- United States
- Vietnam
- Zambia
Governance
- 26 March 2012: Standard registration
- AKP (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Costanza Lefebvre | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Brimicombe | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel George | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Sproule | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.22k | £12.54k | £77.26k | £49.42k | £57.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.32k | £7.81k | £77.94k | £32.03k | £36.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/03/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. 3) THE RELIEF OF THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS OR COMMUNITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abercrombie & Kent
St. Georges House
Ambrose Street
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL50 3LG
- Phone:
- 01242237661
- Email:
- info@akphilanthropy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window