Financial history GROW 4 GOOD SOUTH WEST LTD

Charity number: 1146486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £49.89k £47.48k £46.03k £43.86k £48.86k
Total expenditure £45.20k £45.14k £53.71k £53.06k £54.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A