LUEY JACOB SHARP FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 January 2012: Standard registration
- 09 October 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 April 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03 NOV 2011
Charitable objects
IN MEMORY OF LUEY JACOB SHARP, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST AND APPLY THEM FOR ALL OBJECTS WHICH ARE REGARDED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND PROMOTION OF RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO GASTROSCHISIS; 3.1 2 THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY DEBILITATING, LIFE THREATENING OR TERMINAL ILLNESSES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; 3.1.3 THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE AND, IN PARTICULAR, MARTIN HOUSE (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 517919).
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window