Accounts and annual returns UK ARMED FORCES POLO ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1145778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 25 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 25 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2023 21 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 21 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 03 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 28 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 22 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 28 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 10 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required