UK ARMED FORCES POLO ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support the sport of Polo within Her Majesty's Armed Forces
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Germany
- South Africa
- United States
Governance
- 07 February 2012: Standard registration
- CSPA (Working name)
- COMBINED SERVICES POLO ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- CSPA LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicolas Cowley | Chair | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Major William Mawby | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.07k | £12.00k | £26.80k | £31.76k | £26.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.61k | £16.75k | £25.07k | £44.46k | £45.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/01/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF HER MAJESTY’S ARMED FORCES (THE “ARMED FORCES”) BY INCREASING PHYSICAL FITNESS, FOSTERING THE ESPRIT DE CORPS AND RAISING MORALE OF MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THROUGH FACILITATING AND ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION BY MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES IN POLO AND PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF POLO FOR THE ARMED FORCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carriers Crossing
Stratford Sub Castle
SALISBURY
SP4 6AE
- Phone:
- 07865093516
- Email:
- William.Mawby996@mod.gov.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window