Financial history LIFEBOAT COMMUNITY PROJECT LD

Charity Number: 1145949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £100 £300 £500 £160 £100
Total expenditure £325 £262 £446 £2.21k £343
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A