LONDON ALL NATIONS KOREAN PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide places of worship services of Christian worship and Fellowship facilities allowing Believers practice their faith Organising services of Christian worship prayer meetings Christian teaching preaching public celebration of religious festivals Missionary and outreach work Provision of money management and debt counselling advice Provision of small grants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 December 2011: Standard registration
- LONDON ALL NATIONS CHURCH (Working name)
- LANKPC (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JONG BUM PARK | Chair | 03 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.86k | £54.42k | £75.70k | £54.77k | £37.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.51k | £53.06k | £63.48k | £53.36k | £41.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2024
(These accounts |
14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
19 November 2021 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03 NOV 2011
Charitable objects
3.1 "TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN SURREY AND OTHER PLACES; WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES, AND OVERSEAS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE AND CHRISTIAN DOCTRINES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. 3.2 "THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY MAINLY IN NORBURY AND OTHER PLACES, NATIONALLY OR OVERSEAS BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS AND SUPPORTING OTHER CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS (LOCAL, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS) WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY."
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Cadmer Close
NEW MALDEN
Surrey
KT3 5DG
- Phone:
- 07825880154
- Email:
- ALLNATIONSINLONDON@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window