Financial history FAMILY LOVE MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1145650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £21.09k £79.44k £24.32k £26.84k £27.80k
Total expenditure £22.26k £102.03k £22.20k £34.20k £27.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A