WOODVALE AND AINSDALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arts/Crafts, Blokarting, Bike Maintenance, Canoeing, Chair Based Exercise, Climbing Wall, Community Choir, Employability Training Course, afternoon lunches for older people, Cooking and Healthy Eating courses, Computers, Mums/tots Club, Martial Arts Club, Bike Maintenance classes, Mountain biking sessions, Staying Safe-Self Defence for Women, Tai Chi and chair Tai Chi and youth activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £21,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sefton
Governance
- 22 March 2012: Standard registration
- 21 February 2023: Funds received from 1186746 CREATIVE LOOP (CLOOP)
- WACA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON FIONA MARSHALL | Chair | 07 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Arianne Clarke | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Pendleton | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Thompson | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Boynton | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Lauren Suthren | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNE BURMAN | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.02k | £131.93k | £88.78k | £111.98k | £88.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.43k | £74.09k | £91.31k | £104.49k | £107.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.75k | £60.86k | £21.50k | £45.00k | £21.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 OCT 2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WOODVALE, AINSDALE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 2) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; 3) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodvale Community Centre
Meadow Lane
Woodvale
Southport
PR8 3RS
- Phone:
- 01704573084
- Email:
- manager@woodvalecentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window