HEATHERTON HOUSE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1151060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To develop effective relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school and to engage in activities or provide facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £21,318
Total expenditure: £20,085

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 March 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HEATHERTON HOUSE PARENT/TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Patricia Moir Trustee 16 October 2023
LINDFIELD PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY
Received: 132 days late
LINDFIELD PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY
Received: On time
Sarah Louise Du Casse Trustee 19 October 2022
None on record
Vanessa Bailey Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Nicola Nicoll Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £13.11k £7.26k £17.63k £18.54k £21.32k
Total expenditure £14.69k £3.36k £13.47k £11.24k £20.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 05 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Heatherton House School
10 Copperkins Lane
Amersham
HP6 5QB
Phone:
01494726433
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available