RIDDLESDOWN COLLEGIATE & WOODCOTE HIGH SCHOOL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education for the public benefit and in particular the education of the pupils at any school in respect of which the company acts as a foundation it being acknowledged that in carrying out the objects the company must, so far as is consistent with this purpose, have regard to it's obligation to promote community cohesion under the education acts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 06 December 2011: Standard registration
- 18 June 2014: Removed (Exempt charity)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 25 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/04/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 09/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ANY SCHOOL IN RESPECT OF WHICH THE COMPANY ACTS AS A FOUNDATION HAVING REGARD TO ITS OBLIGATION TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY COHESION UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window