THE RHYTHM STUDIO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Rhythm Foundation is a charity that works alongside The Rhythm Studio to fund music activities for children and young people in London. We offer financial support for music projects based in and out of schools and hospitals, providing young people with musical opportunities that would not otherwise be possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £2,340 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Brent
- City Of Westminster
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 16 January 2012: Standard registration
- THE RHYTHM FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alejandra Lozano Nodar | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francis Gerard Martin | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anne Bishop | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Jenkins | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HODGES | Trustee | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE CAREY | Trustee | 22 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.75k | £77.19k | £68.31k | £95.89k | £61.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.25k | £38.87k | £62.97k | £71.64k | £103.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 10 JAN 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE COMPANY ARE: TO ADVANCE THE MUSIC EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ealing Hammersmith & West London College
Gliddon Road
LONDON
W14 9BL
- Phone:
- 07843424897
- Email:
- info@rsfoundation.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window