GABRIELLE'S ANGEL FOUNDATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of Gabrielle's Angel Foundation UK is to fund research to improve the efficacy of cancer treatments, reduce their toxicity and improve the quality of life of patients with leukemia and lymphoma. We also fund select music therapy programs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 November 2011: Standard registration
- 27 March 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GABRIELLE'S ANGEL FOUNDATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH UK (Working name)
- GABRIELLEÔÇÖS ANGEL FOUNDATION UK (Previous name)
- GABRIELLEÔÇÖS ANGEL FOUNDATION UK (Previous name)
- GABRIELLE'S ANGEL FOUNDATION UK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £373.56k | £521.09k | £854.65k | £1.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £406.97k | £621.81k | £381.71k | £268.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £520.98k | £854.21k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £118 | £435 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £525.31k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £96.50k | £64.55k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £165.00k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 15 December 2016 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 12 February 2016 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 12 February 2016 | 104 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 JUL 2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN LEUKAEMIA, LYMPHOMA AND RELATED CANCERS INCLUDING THROUGH PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO EFFECTIVE THERAPIES AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF; AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF THOSE AFFECTED BY SUCH ILLNESSES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window