Financial history SAVING LIVES

Charity number: 1144855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £455.22k £811.25k £696.02k £519.89k £340.01k
Total expenditure £436.10k £687.38k £559.92k £619.74k £351.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £150.48k £696.02k £519.89k £339.06k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £811.25k £696.02k £519.89k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £687.38k £559.92k £619.74k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £9.38k £12.55k £13.56k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A