Trustees SAVING LIVES

Charity Number: 1144855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Naomi Sutton Trustee 16 March 2020
None on record
Sandra Chidzomba Trustee 18 May 2018
None on record
Catherine Mark Trustee 18 May 2018
None on record
THOMAS SAMUEL HAYES Trustee 11 May 2016
None on record
DANIEL HARTLAND Trustee 29 November 2011
None on record
Dr CLIVE LOVEDAY Trustee 29 November 2011
None on record
Dr STEPHEN TAYLOR Trustee 14 November 2011
None on record