Financial history SUSTAINABLE FOOD TRUST

Charity number: 1148645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £919.20k £951.98k £1.57m £2.15m £1.37m
Total expenditure £818.98k £916.13k £1.52m £1.83m £1.65m
Income from government contracts £35.89k £68.22k N/A N/A £98.51k
Income from government grants N/A £31.87k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £805.07k £770.57k £1.27m £1.58m £747.99k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k
Income - Charitable activities £111.89k £83.87k £279.53k £551.00k £595.60k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £256 £317 £268 £1.35k £3.69k
Income - Other £1.98k £77.22k £667 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £818.98k £916.13k £1.52m £1.83m £1.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £2.78k £0 £8.80k £8.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.11k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0