THE SPECIES RECOVERY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. REMOVE SPECIES FROM THE EDGE OF EXTINCTION IN THE UK THROUGH EFFECTIVE CONSERVATION STRATEGIES INFORMED BY CURRENT SCIENTIFIC KNOWLEDGE. 2. EDUCATE AND ENTHUSE THE PUBLIC TO THE PLIGHT OF SPECIES LOSS IN THE UK. TRAIN A NEW GENERATION OF NATURALISTS IN THE IDENTIFICATION OF ANIMALS AND PLANTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £44,512 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 2012: Standard registration
- ESCT (Working name)
- ENDANGERED SPECIES CONSERVATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jed Hamblin-Boone MA BA FMCI | Chair | 18 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hadler | Trustee | 18 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Berry MAHonsOxon | Trustee | 18 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.03k | £111.23k | £116.96k | £208.56k | £311.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.82k | £82.12k | £114.53k | £185.79k | £256.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £4.47k | N/A | £13.47k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.20k | N/A | £4.00k | N/A | £44.51k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 26/02/2012 AS AMENDED ON 29/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF SPECIES ON THE EDGE OF EXTINCTION IN THE UK FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON ISSUES CONCERNING THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF SUCH SPECIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 ALBANY ROAD
SALISBURY
SP1 3YQ
- Phone:
- 01722322539
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window