Accounts and annual returns COVENTRY BANGLADESH CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1145895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 November 2024 304 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 November 2024 669 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 April 2022 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 April 2022 433 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required