Trustees CORNWALL BIRD WATCHING & PRESERVATION SOCIETY
Charity number: 1144724

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRUCE JOHN TAGGART | Chair | 08 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Arthur Bloomfield | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Mark Lea | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Castillo-Nicholls | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas James Watmough | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jasmina Lidia Goodair | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bob Bosisto | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steve Ashby | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Roseveare | Trustee | 26 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MASON | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Collins | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KEITH PARKER | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY CHARLES BLUNDEN | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Taylor | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK JAMES GRANTHAM | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.