Accounts and annual returns CRESWICK PRE-SCHOOL LTD

Charity Number: 1145213
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 12 November 2024 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 12 November 2024 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 26 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 26 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 06 October 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 06 October 2022 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 23 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 23 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 18 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 18 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window