Financial history CRESWICK PRE-SCHOOL LTD

Charity number: 1145213
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £134.97k £98.29k £113.66k £140.10k £145.40k
Total expenditure £106.39k £124.64k £127.53k £138.36k £148.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £101.66k