OXTON COMMUNITY FUNDRAISERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OCF helps advance rural community development in Oxton, Nottinghamshire through advice to village groups on funding strategies for improving facilities and services and practical help with fundraising - depending on the funding-mix requirement of each emerging village project/initiative. OCF also currently runs a Small Grant Scheme to provide small sums of match-funding for community initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 05 July 2012: Standard registration
- 20 January 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1136160 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
- OCF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11 | £0 | £0 | £10 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 01 February 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 04/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF OXTON AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE THAT FALL WITHIN THE DESCRIPTION OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES (SET OUT IN S. 3(1)(E) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011) BEING THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP OR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT – CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT FALL WITHIN THIS DESCRIPTION BEING: • THE PROMOTION OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY; • THE PROMOTION OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION; • THE PROMOTION OF VOLUNTEERING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WHERE TO DO SO FURTHERS CHARITABLE PURPOSES FALLING WITHIN THE DESCRIPTIONS OF PURPOSES SET OUT IN S. 3 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011; • THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; • PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES; • THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING; AND BY • PROMOTING OR ADVANCING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF CHARITIES CONCERNED WITH SOCIAL INVESTMENT. “THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR” MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. • CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. • VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE TYPES OF INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
OXTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window