POLISH PSYCHOLOGISTS' ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROFESSIONAL PSYCHOLOGICAL SUPPORT TO THE POLISH COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malgorzata Buszynska | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Magdalena Duber | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zaneta Lawecka | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ola Radziszewska | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.51k | £13.02k | £12.54k | £6.64k | £7.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.68k | £14.87k | £16.31k | £7.80k | £9.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 FEB 2007 AS AMENDED ON 25/02/2012 as amended on 27 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE POLISH MIGRANT COMMUNITY IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BY: A) PROMOTING PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING BY PROVIDING FAMILY, COUPLE AND INDIVIDUAL PSYCHOTHERAPY, CONSULTATIONS AND COUNSELLING, SUPPORT GROUPS AND OTHER PSYCHOLOGICAL INTERVENTIONS; B) SHARING PSYCHOLOGICAL KNOWLEDGE AND RESEARCH THROUGH EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING ACTIVITIES AND PUBLISHING RESEARCH AND OTHER MATERIALS PROMOTING MIGRANTS’ PSYCHOLOGICAL WELLBEING. C) PROVIDING A FORUM FOR THE COMMUNITY OF POLISH PSYCHOLOGY GRADUATES AND PRACTITIONERS (MEMBERS), INCLUDING PROVIDING INFORMATION ABOUT PRACTISING PSYCHOLOGY IN THE UK, CREATING NETWORKING AND PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT OPPORTUNITIES TO ENGAGE MEMBERS IN INITIATIVES AND PROJECTS TO SUPPORT THE WIDER POLISH COMMUNITY. (2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN THE POLISH MIGRANT COMMUNITY IN THE UK WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED TO ADDRESS THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: A) SUPPORTING THEIR INTEGRATION INTO THE DIVERSE COMMUNITY OF THE UK BY PROMOTING TOLERANCE AND RESPECT FOR OTHER CULTURES AND RAISING AWARENESS OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES, ESPECIALLY STEREOTYPING, PREJUDICE, HARASSMENT, AND DISCRIMINATION. B) SUPPORTING CAREER PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT WITHIN THE NEW JOB MARKET FOR MIGRANTS WHO ARE IN POVERTY OR UNEMPLOYED. C) TO ENABLE ACCESS TO THE PSYCHOLOGICAL HELP AND SUPPORT SERVICES THAT THE POLISH COMMUNITY MIGHT NOT OTHERWISE RECEIVE DUE TO LANGUAGE BARRIERS AS WELL AS CULTURAL DIFFERENCES AND MIGRANT STATUS. THIS INCLUDES INFORMATION, ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES OFFERED TO ADULTS, FAMILIES AND CHILDREN. D) SUPPORTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION THROUGH CREATING VOLUNTARY, WORK, STUDENT AND MENTORING PLACEMENTS FOR THOSE UNEMPLOYED AND/OR WITH LIMITED CAREER OPPORTUNITIES DUE TO MIGRANT STATUS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
POSK
238-246 King Street
London
W6 0RF
- Phone:
- 07751648434
- Email:
- info@polishpsychologists.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window