Accounts and annual returns HOLLY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1150409
Charity reporting is overdue by 778 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 17 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days
Accounts and TAR 17 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days
Annual return 17 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 412 days
Accounts and TAR 17 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 412 days
Annual return 17 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 778 days
Accounts and TAR 17 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 778 days
Annual return 17 May 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 17 May 2020 05 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 May 2020 Not Required