Financial history BECKLEY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1145248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 07/11/2020 07/11/2021 07/11/2022 07/11/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.92k £1.95k £2.96k £7.60k £7.02k
Total expenditure £3.77k £3.38k £883 £6.35k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A