KNOWLEDGE 4 ALL FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Knowledge 4 All Foundation (K4A) is a non-profit organization headquartered in London, UK, focused on advancing social impact via data science, education, and innovation. The foundation operates through promotion of data science projects and organising events. It attracts collaborators by building relationships with academic and research institutions and participating in international events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Slovenia
Governance
- 09 March 2012: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 16 September 2013: Re-registered
- K4ALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN STEWART SHAWE-TAYLOR FIMA FBCS | Chair | 09 September 2009 |
|
|
||||
DR Rayid Ghani | Trustee | 28 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR DUNJA MLADENIC | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr COLIN DE LA HIGUERA | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JOHN STEWART SHAWE-TAYLOR | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARKO GROBELNIK | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MITJA JERMOL | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £387.99k | £202.54k | £475.85k | £211.17k | £40.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £364.78k | £271.92k | £286.05k | £456.40k | £20.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY PROMOTING AND FACILITATING EQUALITY OF ACCESS TO SCIENTIFIC AND ACADEMIC KNOWLEDGE OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE, WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION OF ANY PARTICULAR KIND, ESPECIALLY BY THE USE OF ELECTRONIC MEDIA OF ALL KINDS, AND FOR THE BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) OF DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Kingston Smith Llp
Betchworth House
57-65 Station Road
REDHILL
RH1 1DL
- Phone:
- 07748141890
- Email:
- info@k4all.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window