MINDSET
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have sought to run a variety of social and activity groups for the benefit of socially excluded people, drawn on the skills, experience and knowledge of socially excluded people in creating a new and robust charity and sought to provide opportunities for people in Nottingham and surrounding area, to improve their mental health through musical, creative and gardening activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 16 August 2012: Standard registration
- 02 October 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 02 October 2018: Funds transferred to 1160885 BEESTON COMMUNITY RESOURCE CIO
- MINDSET (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.26k | £5.36k | £3.82k | £27.08k | £19.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.22k | £4.28k | £3.96k | £24.83k | £20.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.08k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 13 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 24 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | 24 March 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 27 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 25/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR THE PUBLIC IN NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, DERBYSHIRE AND LEICESTERSHIRE, BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES IN ALL ASPECTS OF MUSIC, ARTISTIC CREATIVITY, ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION IN NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, DERBYSHIRE AND LEICESTERSHIRE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH(PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING(THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, DERBYSHIRE AND LEICESTERSHIRE IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE,DERBYSHIRE AND LEICESTERSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window