Financial history MEDHANE ALEM ERITREAN ORTHODOX TEWAHDO CHURCH OF GREATER MANCHESTER

Charity Number: 1145934
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.46k £2.81k £9.57k £13.29k £14.55k
Total expenditure £6.29k £0 £6.62k £8.68k £5.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A