FLINTSHIRE FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Seeded by the Trussell Trust, Flintshire Foodbank exists to offer emergency food to individuals and families in crisis by supplying enough food for 3/4 days, and signposting those in need to appropriate agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Flintshire
Governance
- 18 April 2012: Standard registration
- 17 May 2021: Funds received from 519495 SHOTTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV ANDY LEAKE | Chair | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
stephen Harrison | Trustee | 26 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Owen Jones | Trustee | 08 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUE BEATSON | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.60k | £279.86k | £138.71k | £173.99k | £168.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.40k | £92.71k | £84.73k | £102.68k | £151.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 OCT 2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: (1) TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN CRISIS IN FLINTSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS (BENEFICIARIES) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY FOOD SUPPLIES EITHER DIRECTLY OR THROUGH APPROVED PARTNER AGENCIES. (2) TO PROVIDE SPIRITUAL, PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SUPPORT EITHER DIRECTLY OR BY REFERRAL TO APPROVED PARTNER AGENCIES TO ENABLE THE BENEFICIARIES TO AVOID FUTURE CRISES. (3) TO DO ANYTHING CONSISTENT WITH THE PRIMARY PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Former Library HQ
Raikes Lane
MOLD
Clwyd
CH7 6NW
- Phone:
- 01352757235
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window