Trustees WORSTEAD GUILD OF WEAVERS SPINNERS AND DYERS
Charity number: 1144939

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth George | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paulette Solomon | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
lorraine Hunter | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gilly Bell | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Gelinas | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Sutton | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Weisner | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Gosling-Belfield | Trustee | 28 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WELLERD | Trustee | 28 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.