Trustees WINCHESTER STUDENT UNION

Charity number: 1147846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexandra Wilson Chair 01 July 2024
WINCHESTER STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered
Vedika Joshi Trustee 01 July 2024
WINCHESTER STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered
George Samuel Watkinson-Biddulph Trustee 01 July 2024
WINCHESTER STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered
Sally Louise Fox Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Phoebe Trueman Trustee 28 February 2023
WINCHESTER STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered
Ruth Westbury Trustee 28 February 2023
WINCHESTER STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered
Charles Beard Trustee 28 January 2023
WINCHESTER STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered
John Wilson Trustee 28 January 2023
WINCHESTER STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered
Lucy Emily Dixon Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
James Walker Trustee 05 October 2020
WINCHESTER STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered
James Dickinson Trustee 01 November 2017
None on record