North West Pre-hospital Critical Care Charity

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING INJURY OR ILLNESS BY THE PROVISION OF IMMEDIATE CARE IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL REGION OF CHESHIRE, MANCHESTER, MERSEYSIDE, LANCASHIRE AND ADJACENT AREAS AND TO ADVANCE THE STUDY OF IMMEDIATE MEDICAL CARE BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Stockport
- Wirral
Governance
- 01 May 1973: Standard registration
- CHESHIRE & SHROPSHIRE IMMEDIATE CARE GROUP (Previous name)
- CHESHIRE ROAD ACCIDENT SERVICE SCHEME (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dane Smith | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Graeme Spencer | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Darren Cabaniuk | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.18k | £17.26k | £56.49k | £37.38k | £37.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.38k | £18.33k | £48.04k | £51.80k | £13.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 291 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 291 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/02/1973 AS AMENDED ON 08/11/2008 as amended on 17 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING INJURY OR ILLNESS BY THE PROVISION OF IMMEDIATE CARE IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL REGION OF CHESHIRE AND SHROPSHIRE AND ADJACENT AREAS AND TO ADVANCE THE STUDY OF IMMEDIATE MEDICAL CARE BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING.
Area of benefit
CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Barfold Close
STOCKPORT
Cheshire
SK2 5XY
- Phone:
- 07714456657
- Email:
- secretary@nwpcc.charity
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window