Financial history CARDIFF PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1145130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £24.79k £2.25k £42.97k £46.37k £87.98k
Total expenditure £27.02k £3.39k £46.05k £35.20k £32.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A