KILLINGHALL VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The village hall operates 2 halls in the centre of the village & is used primarily for social, recreational & leisure purposes for village residents, ranging from the young (play school, youth club, parties) to the elderly (luncheons, whist, quiz's, yoga) etc. It is sometimes hired to host adjoining village/district functions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 01 July 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MERYLL JANE CASTLE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN GREGORY BLACKBURN | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Turner | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anne Holdsworth | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Graham Jelley | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN INGRAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICK SMEDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIONA PEPPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.96k | £3.67k | £14.18k | £12.32k | £13.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.12k | £5.11k | £15.75k | £9.77k | £21.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 12 NOVEMBER 1937 AND SCHEME OF THE 8 MAY 1974.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF KILLINGHALL WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF KILLINGHALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 OTLEY ROAD
KILLINGHALL
HARROGATE
HG3 2DN
- Phone:
- 01423508496
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window