RAJAURI BIRMINGHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Birmingham City and neighborhood without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, nationality, age, disability, race or of political, religious or other opinions, by associating together the said inhabitants and the statutory authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 13 July 2012: Standard registration
- RAJAURI BIRMINGHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED ARSHAD | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD ZAHID | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD BASHIR | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.71k | £87.63k | £83.98k | £58.00k | £64.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.01k | £31.81k | £37.81k | £16.52k | £45.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 June 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 June 2023 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 June 2023 | 391 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 June 2023 | 391 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 28 July 2020 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 28 July 2020 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEP 2010 AS AMENDED ON 10/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMMUNITY CENTRE ARE TO: PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BIRMINGHAM CITY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT, OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED “THE CENTRE”) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
George Court
17 George Street
Birmingham
B12 9RG
- Phone:
- 01214408030
- Email:
- info@moughalca.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window